Senate | 05/22/2023 | Certified copies of resolutions sent. | ||
Senate | 04/05/2023 | Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1). | ||
Senate | 04/04/2023 | One Day Notice 04-05-23. | ||
Senate | 04/04/2023 | Reported from LBT/GVO (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1620) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1). | ||
Senate | 03/29/2023 | The committee(s) on GVO recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in GVO were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) McKelvey, San Buenaventura, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard, Wakai. | ||
Senate | 03/29/2023 | The committee(s) on LBT recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in LBT were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Moriwaki, Lee, Ihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Fevella. | ||
Senate | 03/24/2023 | The committee(s) on LBT/GVO has scheduled a public hearing on 03-29-23 3:00PM; Conference Room 224 & Videoconference. | ||
Senate | 03/24/2023 | Re-Referred to LBT/GVO. | ||
Senate | 03/15/2023 | Referred to LBT. | ||
Senate | 03/10/2023 | Offered. |