Senate | 05/22/2023 | Certified copies of resolutions sent. | ||
Senate | 04/05/2023 | Report and Resolution Adopted. Aye(s) with reservations: none. Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Awa). | ||
Senate | 04/04/2023 | One Day Notice 04-05-23. | ||
Senate | 04/04/2023 | Reported from GVO/HHS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1630) with recommendation of adoption. | ||
Senate | 03/31/2023 | The committee(s) on HHS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HHS were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) San Buenaventura, Aquino, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Awa; and 0 Excused: none. | ||
Senate | 03/31/2023 | The committee(s) on GVO recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in GVO were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) McKelvey, Gabbard, San Buenaventura; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Awa; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Wakai. | ||
Senate | 03/28/2023 | The committee(s) on GVO/HHS has scheduled a public hearing on 03-31-23 1:00PM; Conference Room 225 & Videoconference. | ||
Senate | 03/24/2023 | Re-Referred to GVO/HHS. | ||
Senate | 03/15/2023 | Referred to GVO. | ||
Senate | 03/10/2023 | Offered. |