Senate | 05/22/2023 | Certified copies of resolutions sent. | ||
Senate | 04/05/2023 | Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1). | ||
Senate | 04/04/2023 | One Day Notice 04-05-23. | ||
Senate | 04/04/2023 | Reported from PSM/HWN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1563) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1). | ||
Senate | 03/29/2023 | The committee(s) on HWN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HWN were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Shimabukuro, Fevella, Keohokalole; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara, Richards. | ||
Senate | 03/29/2023 | The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in PSM were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Elefante, Fukunaga, McKelvey, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Wakai. | ||
Senate | 03/22/2023 | The committee(s) on PSM/HWN has scheduled a public hearing on 03-29-23 3:00PM; Conference Room 225 & Videoconference. | ||
Senate | 03/15/2023 | Referred to PSM/HWN. | ||
Senate | 03/10/2023 | Offered. |