|
12/11/2023
|
Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2023
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Kapela voting no (1) and Representative(s) Marten excused (1).
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2023
|
Reported from WAL/LGO (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 723) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2023
|
The committee on LGO recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Matayoshi, Garrett, Martinez, Sayama; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Kapela, Tam, Alcos; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2023
|
The committee on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Ichiyama, Poepoe, Chun, Takayama, Souza; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Ganaden, Morikawa; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Hashem.
|
|
|
House
|
02/03/2023
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by WAL/LGO on Tuesday, 02-14-23 11:15AM in House conference room 309 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
01/30/2023
|
Referred to WAL/LGO, FIN, referral sheet 3
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2023
|
Introduced and Pass First Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
01/23/2023
|
Pending introduction.
|
|
|