House
|
03/20/2024
|
Received notice of all Senate conferees being discharged (Sen. Com. No. 340).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2024
|
Senate Conferee(s) discharged.
|
|
|
|
12/11/2023
|
Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 983).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Senate Conferees Appointed: Dela Cruz Chair; Keith-Agaran, Fevella.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2023
|
Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 800).
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2023
|
House disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2023
|
Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 885) in amended form (SD 2).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2023
|
Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 22; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 3 (Senator(s) DeCoite, Ihara, Keohokalole). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2023
|
48 Hrs. Notice 04-13-23
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2023
|
Floor amendment adopted as amended (SD 2).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2023
|
Floor Amendment No. 5 offered.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2023
|
48 Hrs. Notice 04-11-23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2023
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2023
|
Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1782) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2023
|
The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Aquino, DeCoite, Inouye, Kanuha, Kim, Lee, Shimabukuro, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Kidani, Moriwaki.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2023
|
The committee on WAM will reconsider its previous decision made on 04-04-23 and will hold a public decision making on 04-05-2023 12:31 PM; Conference Room 211.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2023
|
The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 13 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Aquino, DeCoite, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Kim, Lee, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2023
|
The committee(s) on WAM deferred the measure until 04-04-23 10:35AM; Conference Room 211.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2023
|
The committee(s) on WAM has scheduled a public hearing on 04-03-23 9:40AM; Conference Room 211 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2023
|
Referred to WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 389).
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2023
|
Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-07-23.
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2023
|
Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1164) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2023
|
The committee on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamashita, Kitagawa, Aiu, Chun, Cochran, Garrett, Kahaloa, Kila, Kobayashi, Lamosao, Morikawa, Nishimoto, Poepoe, Takenouchi, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Alcos.
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2023
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 03-01-23 2:30PM in House conference room 308 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2023
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Marten excused (1).
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2023
|
Reported from EDN/ECD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 697) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2023
|
The committee on ECD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Holt, Lamosao, Kong, Nakamura, Quinlan; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Hussey-Burdick, Pierick.
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2023
|
The committee on EDN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Woodson, Marten, Kapela, Martinez, Matayoshi, Perruso, Quinlan, Todd; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Garcia.
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2023
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by EDN/ECD on Tuesday, 02-14-23 2:00PM in House conference room 309 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
02/03/2023
|
Re-referred to EDN/ECD, FIN, referral sheet 10
|
|
|
House
|
01/30/2023
|
Referred to EDN, FIN, referral sheet 3
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2023
|
Introduced and Pass First Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
01/23/2023
|
Pending introduction.
|
|
|