|
12/11/2023
|
Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2023
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2023
|
Reported from TCA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1387) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2023
|
The committee(s) on TCA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TCA were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Lee, Inouye, Elefante, Keohokalole, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2023
|
The committee(s) on TCA has scheduled a public hearing on 03-21-23 3:00PM; CR 224 & Videoconference (Proposed Draft).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2023
|
The committee(s) on TCA deleted the measure from the public hearing scheduled on 03-21-23 3:00PM; CR 224 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2023
|
The committee(s) on TCA has scheduled a public hearing on 03-21-23 3:00PM; Conference Room 224 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2023
|
Referred to TCA, WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 254).
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2023
|
Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-07-23.
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2023
|
Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1069) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2023
|
The committee on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Tarnas, Takayama, Ganaden, Holt, Hashimoto, Ichiyama, Ilagan, Kong, Mizuno, Souza; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2023
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Thursday, 02-16-23 2:00PM in House conference room 325 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2023
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kitagawa excused (1).
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2023
|
Reported from CAI (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 422) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JHA.
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2023
|
The committee on CAI recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Tam, Martinez, Garrett, Kapela, Matayoshi, Sayama, Alcos; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
02/03/2023
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by CAI on Wednesday, 02-08-23 8:30AM in House conference room 309 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2023
|
Referred to CAI, JHA, referral sheet 1
|
|
|
House
|
01/19/2023
|
Introduced and Pass First Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
01/17/2023
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|