|
12/11/2023
|
Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2023
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2023
|
Reported from PSM/HRE (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1362) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
The committee(s) on HRE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HRE were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kim, Kidani, Fukunaga, Keith-Agaran; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in PSM were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Elefante, Fukunaga, McKelvey, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2023
|
The committee(s) on PSM/HRE has scheduled a public hearing on 03-22-23 3:17PM; Conference Room 225 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Referred to PSM/HRE, WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2023
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2023
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 111).
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 870), recommending passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2023
|
The committee on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamashita, Kitagawa, Aiu, Chun, Cochran, Garrett, Kahaloa, Kila, Lamosao, Morikawa, Nishimoto, Poepoe, Takenouchi, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Kobayashi, Alcos.
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2023
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 02-22-23 2:30PM in House conference room 308 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
02/13/2023
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kapela excused (1).
|
|
|
House
|
02/13/2023
|
Reported from CMV (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 293) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2023
|
The committee on CMV recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Hashem, Chun, Ganaden, Ichiyama, Morikawa, Poepoe, Takayama, Souza; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
02/03/2023
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by CMV on Wednesday, 02-08-23 9:00AM in House conference room 430 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
01/30/2023
|
Referred to CMV, FIN, referral sheet 3
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2023
|
Introduced and Pass First Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
01/24/2023
|
Pending introduction.
|
|
|