12/11/2023 | Carried over to 2024 Regular Session. | |||
House | 02/01/2023 | Re-referred to HUS/HLT, FIN, referral sheet 5 | ||
House | 01/30/2023 | This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Thursday 02-02-23 9:00AM in conference room 329 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. | ||
House | 01/30/2023 | Bill scheduled to be heard by HUS on Thursday, 02-02-23 9:00AM in House conference room 329 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. | ||
House | 01/30/2023 | Referred to HUS, HLT, FIN, referral sheet 3 | ||
House | 01/25/2023 | Introduced and Pass First Reading. | ||
House | 01/24/2023 | Pending introduction. |