House
|
03/20/2024
|
Received notice of all Senate conferees being discharged (Sen. Com. No. 340).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2024
|
Senate Conferee(s) discharged.
|
|
|
|
12/11/2023
|
Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2023
|
Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 909).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
Senate Conferees Appointed: San Buenaventura Chair; Rhoads, Lee Co-Chairs.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2023
|
Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 800).
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2023
|
House disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 852) in amended form (SD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2023
|
Report Adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Fevella. Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Awa). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Keohokalole). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2023
|
One Day Notice 04-11-23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2023
|
Reported from JDC/WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1850) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2023
|
The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Aquino, DeCoite, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Kim, Lee, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Fevella ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Moriwaki, Shimabukuro.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2023
|
The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDC were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Gabbard, Elefante, San Buenaventura; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Awa; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2023
|
The committee(s) on JDC/WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-04-23 10:00AM; Conference Room 211 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2023
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC/WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2023
|
Reported from HHS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1413) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC/WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
The committee(s) on HHS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HHS were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) San Buenaventura, Aquino, Moriwaki; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 2 No(es): Senator(s) Shimabukuro, Awa; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2023
|
The committee(s) on HHS has scheduled a public hearing on 03-22-23 1:01PM; Conference Room 225 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Referred to HHS, JDC/WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 211).
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2023
|
Passed Third Reading with Representative(s) Cochran voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Garcia, Ward voting no (2) and Representative(s) Alcos, Matayoshi excused (2). Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2023
|
Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 984), recommending passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2023
|
The committee on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamashita, Kitagawa, Aiu, Chun, Kila, Kobayashi, Lamosao, Morikawa, Nishimoto, Takenouchi; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Cochran, Garrett, Kahaloa, Poepoe, Alcos; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Ward; and Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2023
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 02-23-23 1:30PM in House conference room 308 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2023
|
Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Marten excused (1).
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2023
|
Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 744) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN.
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2023
|
The committee on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Sayama, Amato, Belatti, Hashem, Hussey-Burdick, Lowen, Onishi, Tam, Pierick; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Gates.
|
|
|
House
|
02/13/2023
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Wednesday, 02-15-23 2:00PM in House conference room 329 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2023
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kila, Lamosao excused (2).
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2023
|
Reported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 263) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC.
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2023
|
The committee on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Belatti, Takenouchi, Amato, Ilagan, Kobayashi, Mizuno, Nishimoto, Garcia; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2023
|
Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 02-08-23 11:40AM in conference room 329 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
02/04/2023
|
The committee(s) on HLT recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-08-23.
|
|
|
House
|
02/02/2023
|
Re-referred to HLT, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 9
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2023
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Saturday, 02-04-23 9:30AM in House conference room 329 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
01/30/2023
|
Referred to HLT, JHA/CPC, FIN, referral sheet 3
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2023
|
Introduced and Pass First Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
01/24/2023
|
Pending introduction.
|
|
|