|
12/11/2023
|
Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2023
|
The committee(s) on WAL recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
|
|
|
House
|
02/10/2023
|
Bill re-scheduled to be heard by WAL on Tuesday, 02-14-23 8:30AM in conference room 430 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2023
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by WAL on Tuesday, 02-14-23 9:30AM in House conference room 430 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2023
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on WAL with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2023
|
Reported from TOU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 119) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to WAL.
|
|
|
House
|
02/02/2023
|
The committee on TOU recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Quinlan, Hussey-Burdick, Holt, Kong, Lamosao, Nakamura, Pierick; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
01/30/2023
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by TOU on Thursday, 02-02-23 10:00AM in House conference room 423 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
01/30/2023
|
Referred to TOU, WAL, FIN, referral sheet 3
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2023
|
Introduced and Pass First Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
01/24/2023
|
Pending introduction.
|
|
|