|
12/11/2023
|
Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2023
|
Referred to CPN, WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 421).
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Amato, Kapela voting no (2) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2023
|
Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-07-23.
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2023
|
Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1149) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2023
|
The committee on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamashita, Kitagawa, Aiu, Chun, Cochran, Garrett, Kahaloa, Kila, Kobayashi, Lamosao, Morikawa, Poepoe, Takenouchi, Alcos, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Nishimoto.
|
|
|
House
|
02/24/2023
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Monday, 02-27-23 11:30AM in House conference room 308 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2023
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Kapela voting no (1) and none excused (0).
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2023
|
Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 493) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2023
|
The committee on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Sayama, Amato, Belatti, Hashem, Hussey-Burdick, Lowen, Onishi, Tam, Pierick; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Gates.
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2023
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Thursday, 02-09-23 2:00PM in House conference room 329 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
01/30/2023
|
Referred to CPC, FIN, referral sheet 3
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2023
|
Introduced and Pass First Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
01/24/2023
|
Pending introduction.
|
|
|