|
12/11/2023
|
Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDC.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Reported from AEN/HHS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1331) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to JDC.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2023
|
The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in AEN were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Richards, DeCoite, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Rhoads ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2023
|
The committee(s) on HHS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HHS were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) San Buenaventura, Aquino, Shimabukuro, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Moriwaki.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2023
|
The committee(s) on AEN/HHS has scheduled a public hearing on 03-20-23 1:30PM; Conference Room 224 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2023
|
Referred to AEN/HHS, JDC.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 423).
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2023
|
Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-07-23.
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2023
|
Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1084) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
02/24/2023
|
The committee on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Tarnas, Takayama, Ganaden, Hashimoto, Ichiyama, Ilagan, Kong, Mizuno, Souza; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Holt.
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2023
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Friday, 02-24-23 2:00PM in House conference room 325 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2023
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Marten excused (1).
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2023
|
Reported from AGR/HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 675) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JHA.
|
|
|
House
|
02/13/2023
|
The committee on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Belatti, Takenouchi, Amato, Ilagan, Kobayashi; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Mizuno, Nishimoto, Garcia.
|
|
|
House
|
02/13/2023
|
The committee on AGR recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Gates, Kahaloa, Cochran, Perruso, Woodson; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Lowen, Ward.
|
|
|
House
|
02/10/2023
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by AGR/HLT on Monday, 02-13-23 2:05PM in House conference room 312 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
01/30/2023
|
Referred to AGR/HLT, JHA, referral sheet 3
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2023
|
Introduced and Pass First Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
01/24/2023
|
Pending introduction.
|
|
|