Senate
|
03/07/2024
|
Act 001, 03/05/2024 (Gov. Msg. No. 1101).
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
Act 001, on 03/05/2024 (Gov. Msg. No. 1101).
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2024
|
Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 4).
|
|
|
House
|
02/12/2024
|
Transmitted to Governor.
|
|
|
House
|
02/12/2024
|
Passed Final Reading with none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Amato, Lowen, Nakashima, Quinlan, Todd excused (5).
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2024
|
Deferred two days 02-12-24.
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2024
|
Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 6).
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2024
|
Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Awa). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2024
|
One Day Notice 02-07-24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2024
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2024
|
Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2151) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/25/2024
|
The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDC were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Gabbard, Elefante, San Buenaventura; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Awa; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/19/2024
|
The committee(s) on JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 01-25-24 10:00AM; Conference Room 016 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
|
12/11/2023
|
Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2023
|
Referred to JDC.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2023
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2023
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 11).
|
|
|
House
|
02/13/2023
|
Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kapela excused (1). Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
02/10/2023
|
Passed Second Reading; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
|
|
|
House
|
02/10/2023
|
Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 285), recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
02/02/2023
|
The committee on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Tarnas, Takayama, Ganaden, Holt, Hashimoto, Ilagan, Kong, Mizuno, Souza; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ichiyama.
|
|
|
House
|
01/31/2023
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Thursday, 02-02-23 2:00PM in House conference room 325 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2023
|
Referred to JHA, referral sheet 1
|
|
|
House
|
01/19/2023
|
Introduced and Pass First Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
01/17/2023
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|