12/11/2023 | Carried over to 2024 Regular Session. | |||
House | 02/09/2023 | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kila, Lamosao excused (2). | ||
House | 02/09/2023 | Reported from TOU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 249) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC. | ||
House | 02/07/2023 | The committee on TOU recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Quinlan, Hussey-Burdick, Holt, Lamosao, Nakamura, Pierick; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Kong. | ||
House | 02/03/2023 | Bill scheduled to be heard by TOU on Tuesday, 02-07-23 10:00AM in House conference room 423 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. | ||
House | 01/25/2023 | Referred to TOU, CPC, referral sheet 1 | ||
House | 01/19/2023 | Introduced and Pass First Reading. | ||
House | 01/11/2023 | Prefiled. |