12/11/2023 | Carried over to 2024 Regular Session. | |||
House | 02/15/2023 | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). | ||
House | 02/15/2023 | Reported from ECD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 466) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. | ||
House | 02/10/2023 | The committee on ECD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Holt, Lamosao, Hussey-Burdick, Kong, Nakamura, Pierick; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Quinlan. | ||
House | 02/08/2023 | Bill scheduled to be heard by ECD on Friday, 02-10-23 10:30AM in House conference room 423 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. | ||
House | 01/30/2023 | Referred to ECD, FIN, referral sheet 3 | ||
House | 01/25/2023 | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |