12/11/2023 | Carried over to 2024 Regular Session. | |||
House | 02/16/2023 | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Todd excused (1). | ||
House | 02/16/2023 | Reported from AGR (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 545) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC. | ||
House | 02/13/2023 | The committee on AGR recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Gates, Kahaloa, Cochran, Lowen, Perruso, Woodson, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. | ||
House | 02/10/2023 | Bill scheduled to be heard by AGR on Monday, 02-13-23 2:20PM in House conference room 312 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. | ||
House | 01/30/2023 | Referred to AGR, CPC, referral sheet 3 | ||
House | 01/25/2023 | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |