12/11/2023 | Carried over to 2024 Regular Session. | |||
House | 02/15/2023 | The committee(s) on HLT recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. | ||
House | 02/08/2023 | Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 02-15-23 11:30AM in conference room 329 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. | ||
House | 02/08/2023 | The committee(s) on HLT recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-15-23. | ||
House | 02/06/2023 | Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Wednesday, 02-08-23 9:45AM in House conference room 329 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. | ||
House | 01/30/2023 | Referred to HLT, FIN, referral sheet 3 | ||
House | 01/25/2023 | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |