Senate
|
03/25/2024
|
Received notice of discharge of all conferees (Hse. Com. No. 457).
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2024
|
House Conferee(s) discharged.
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2024
|
Received notice of all Senate conferees being discharged (Sen. Com. No. 340).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2024
|
Senate Conferee(s) discharged.
|
|
|
|
12/11/2023
|
Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-28-23 11:00AM in conference room 224.
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday 04-27-23 11:00AM in conference room 224.
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Wednesday 04-26-23 11:00AM in conference room 224.
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2023
|
Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Tuesday, 04-25-23 11:00AM in conference room 224.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2023
|
Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 839).
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2023
|
House Conferees Appointed: Hashimoto, Sayama, Kitagawa Co-Chairs; Aiu, Evslin, Matsumoto.
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 914).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Senate Conferees Appointed: Keohokalole Chair; Rhoads, Kim Co-Chairs; Fukunaga, McKelvey.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2023
|
Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 800).
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2023
|
House disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 875) in amended form (SD 2).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2023
|
Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Awa). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Keohokalole). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2023
|
48 Hrs. Notice 04-11-23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2023
|
Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1747) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2023
|
The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 13 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Aquino, DeCoite, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Kim, Lee, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2023
|
The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-04-23 10:30AM; Conference Room 211 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2023
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2023
|
Reported from CPN/JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1394) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2023
|
The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 2 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keohokalole, McKelvey; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Awa; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Fukunaga, Richards.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2023
|
The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Gabbard, Elefante, San Buenaventura; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Awa; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2023
|
The committee(s) on CPN/JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 03-17-23 9:40AM; Conference Room 016 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Referred to CPN/JDC, WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 228).
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2023
|
Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Pierick voting no (1) and Representative(s) Alcos, Matayoshi excused (2). Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2023
|
Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 979), recommending passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
02/24/2023
|
The committee on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamashita, Kitagawa, Aiu, Chun, Cochran, Kahaloa, Kila, Kobayashi, Lamosao, Morikawa, Nishimoto, Poepoe, Takenouchi, Alcos, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Garrett.
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2023
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Friday, 02-24-23 10:00AM in House conference room 308 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2023
|
Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Marten excused (1).
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2023
|
Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 750) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN.
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2023
|
The committee on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Sayama, Amato, Belatti, Hashem, Hussey-Burdick, Lowen, Onishi, Tam; Ayes with reservations: none; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Pierick; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Gates.
|
|
|
House
|
02/13/2023
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Wednesday, 02-15-23 2:00PM in House conference room 329 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2023
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2023
|
Reported from HSG (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 157) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC.
|
|
|
House
|
02/03/2023
|
The committee on HSG recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Hashimoto, Aiu, Kila, Kitagawa, Marten, Onishi, Todd, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2023
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by HSG on Friday, 02-03-23 9:00AM in House conference room 312 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
01/30/2023
|
Referred to HSG, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 3
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2023
|
Introduced and Pass First Reading.
|
|
|