12/11/2023 | Carried over to 2024 Regular Session. | |||
House | 02/13/2023 | The committee(s) on AGR recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. | ||
House | 02/10/2023 | Bill scheduled for decision making on Monday, 02-13-23 2:00PM in conference room 312 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. | ||
House | 02/10/2023 | The committee(s) on AGR recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-13-23. | ||
House | 02/08/2023 | Bill scheduled to be heard by AGR on Friday, 02-10-23 10:00AM in House conference room 325 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. | ||
House | 01/30/2023 | Referred to AGR, FIN, referral sheet 3 | ||
House | 01/25/2023 | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |