Senate
|
03/07/2024
|
Referred to HOU/PSM, CPN/WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2024
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2024
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 66).
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2024
|
Passed Third Reading with Representative(s) La Chica voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Garcia, Pierick voting no (2) and Representative(s) Cochran, Quinlan, Woodson excused (3). Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2024
|
Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 865-24), recommending passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2024
|
The committee on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Sayama, Amato, Belatti, Hashem, Hussey-Burdick, Lowen, Onishi, Tam; Ayes with reservations: none; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Pierick; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Gates.
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Tuesday, 02-27-24 2:00PM in House conference room 329 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2024
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Matayoshi, Takayama, Todd excused (3).
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2024
|
Reported from HSG (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 362-24) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC.
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2024
|
The committee on HSG recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Evslin, Aiu, Kitagawa, Miyake, Onishi, Todd, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Kila.
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2024
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by HSG on Friday, 02-09-24 10:00AM in House conference room 312 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
01/24/2024
|
Referred to HSG, CPC, referral sheet 1
|
|
|
House
|
01/17/2024
|
Introduced and Pass First Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
01/08/2024
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|