House
|
02/14/2024
|
Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with Representative(s) Matsumoto voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Alcos, Garcia, Kong, Pierick, Ward voting no (5) and Representative(s) Matayoshi, Takayama, Todd excused (3).
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2024
|
Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 384-24) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN.
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2024
|
The committee on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Tarnas, Takayama, Ganaden, Ichiyama, Ilagan, Souza; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Evslin, Holt; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Kong; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Miyake.
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2024
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Thursday, 02-08-24 2:00PM in House conference room 325 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
02/05/2024
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with Representative(s) Matsumoto voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Alcos, Garcia, Kong, Pierick, Ward voting no (5) and Representative(s) Cochran, Gates, Kapela, Nakashima excused (4).
|
|
|
House
|
02/05/2024
|
Reported from EDN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 41-24) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JHA.
|
|
|
House
|
01/30/2024
|
The committee on EDN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Woodson, La Chica, Kapela, Marten, Martinez, M. Mizuno, Perruso, Todd; Ayes with reservations: none; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Garcia; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Matayoshi, Quinlan.
|
|
|
House
|
01/26/2024
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by EDN on Tuesday, 01-30-24 2:00PM in House conference room 309 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
01/24/2024
|
Referred to EDN, JHA, FIN, referral sheet 1
|
|
|
House
|
01/17/2024
|
Introduced and Pass First Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
01/12/2024
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|