Senate
|
04/18/2024
|
Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 760).
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2024
|
House Conferees Appointed: Todd, Nakashima Co-Chairs; Kila, Nishimoto, Matsumoto.
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2024
|
Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 677).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2024
|
Senate Conferees Appointed: Lee Chair; Rhoads, Keohokalole Co-Chairs.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2024
|
Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 731).
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2024
|
House disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2024
|
Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 496) in amended form (SD 2).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2024
|
Report Adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 19; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Aquino, Fukunaga, Ihara, Inouye, Kidani, McKelvey. Noes, 6 (Senator(s) Awa, DeCoite, Elefante, Fevella, Kim, Richards). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2024
|
48 Hrs. Notice 04-09-24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2024
|
Reported from JDC/CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3740) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2024
|
The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keohokalole, Richards; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Fukunaga ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) McKelvey, Awa.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2024
|
The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Gabbard; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Elefante ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) San Buenaventura, Awa.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2024
|
The committee(s) on JDC/CPN will hold a public decision making on 04-02-24 9:30AM; Conference Room 016 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2024
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC/CPN.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2024
|
Reported from TCA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3344) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC/CPN.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2024
|
The committee(s) on TCA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TCA were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Lee, Kanuha; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Inouye, Elefante ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Awa.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2024
|
The committee(s) on TCA deferred the measure until 03-21-24 3:05PM; CR 224.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2024
|
The committee(s) on TCA deferred the measure until 03-19-24 3:05PM; CR 224.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2024
|
The committee(s) on TCA has scheduled a public hearing on 03-14-24 3:00PM; Conference Room 224 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2024
|
Referred to TCA, JDC/CPN.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2024
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2024
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 70).
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2024
|
Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Garcia, Hussey-Burdick, Kapela, Perruso, Pierick voting no (5) and Representative(s) Cochran, Quinlan, Woodson excused (3). Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2024
|
Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 866-24), recommending passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2024
|
The committee on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Sayama, Amato, Belatti, Hashem, Gates, Lowen, Onishi, Tam; Ayes with reservations: none; 2 Noes: Representative(s) Hussey-Burdick, Pierick; and Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2024
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Wednesday, 02-28-24 2:00PM in House conference room 329 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
02/12/2024
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with Representative(s) Kapela, Perruso voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Garcia, Pierick voting no (2) and Representative(s) Amato, Lowen, Nakashima, Quinlan, Todd excused (5).
|
|
|
House
|
02/12/2024
|
Reported from TRN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 260-24) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC.
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2024
|
The committee on TRN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Todd, Kila, Aiu, Evslin, Kitagawa, Miyake, Onishi, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
02/02/2024
|
Bill scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 02-06-24 10:00AM in conference room 312 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2024
|
The committee(s) on TRN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-06-24.
|
|
|
House
|
01/29/2024
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by TRN on Thursday, 02-01-24 10:00AM in House conference room 312 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
01/24/2024
|
Referred to TRN, CPC, referral sheet 1
|
|
|
House
|
01/17/2024
|
Introduced and Pass First Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
01/12/2024
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|