House | 02/07/2024 | The committee(s) on HLT recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. | ||
House | 02/02/2024 | Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 02-07-24 11:30AM in conference room 329 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. | ||
House | 02/02/2024 | The committee(s) on HLT recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-07-24 11:30 AM, House conference room 329. | ||
House | 01/30/2024 | Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Friday, 02-02-24 8:30AM in House conference room 329 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. | ||
House | 01/24/2024 | Referred to HLT, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 1 | ||
House | 01/17/2024 | Introduced and Pass First Reading. | ||
House | 01/12/2024 | Prefiled. |