House | 02/06/2024 | The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. | ||
House | 02/02/2024 | Bill scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 02-06-24 2:00PM in conference room 329 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. | ||
House | 01/30/2024 | The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-06-24. | ||
House | 01/26/2024 | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Tuesday, 01-30-24 2:00PM in House conference room 329 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. | ||
House | 01/24/2024 | Referred to CPC, JHA, referral sheet 1 | ||
House | 01/17/2024 | Introduced and Pass First Reading. | ||
House | 01/16/2024 | Prefiled. |