Senate
|
06/24/2024
|
Act 060, 06/21/2024 (Gov. Msg. No. 1161).
|
|
|
House
|
06/24/2024
|
Act 060, on 06/21/2024 (Gov. Msg. No. 1161).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2024
|
Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 830).
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2024
|
Transmitted to Governor.
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2024
|
Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 798).
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2024
|
Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Kong voting no (1) and none excused (0).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2024
|
Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none. Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Awa). Excused, 0 (none).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2024
|
48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-01-24
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2024
|
Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 57-24).
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2024
|
Forty-eight (48) hours notice Wednesday 05-01-24.
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2024
|
Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 57-24) as amended in (CD 1).
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2024
|
The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Todd, Nakashima, Kila, Onishi, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2024
|
The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Lee, Keohokalole, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2024
|
Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday 04-25-24 5:00PM in conference room 329.
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2024
|
Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 772).
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2024
|
Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Thursday, 04-25-24 9:57AM in conference room 329.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2024
|
Senate Conferees Appointed: Lee Chair; Keohokalole Co-Chair; Fevella.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2024
|
Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 738).
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2024
|
House Conferees Appointed: Todd, Nakashima Co-Chairs; Kila, Onishi, Matsumoto.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2024
|
Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 731).
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2024
|
House disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2024
|
Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 498) in amended form (SD 2).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2024
|
Report Adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) DeCoite, Inouye. Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Awa). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2024
|
48 Hrs. Notice 04-09-24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2024
|
Reported from CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3730) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2024
|
The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keohokalole, Fukunaga, McKelvey, Richards; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Awa.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2024
|
The committee(s) on CPN will hold a public decision making on 04-04-24 10:45AM; Conference Room 229 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2024
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to CPN.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2024
|
Reported from TCA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3339) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to CPN.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2024
|
The committee(s) on TCA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TCA were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Lee, Elefante, Kanuha; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Inouye ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Awa.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2024
|
The committee(s) on TCA deferred the measure until 03-21-24 3:05PM; CR 224.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2024
|
The committee(s) on TCA deferred the measure until 03-19-24 3:05PM; CR 224.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2024
|
The committee(s) on TCA has scheduled a public hearing on 03-14-24 3:00PM; Conference Room 224 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2024
|
Referred to TCA, CPN.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2024
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2024
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 73).
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2024
|
Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Amato voting no (1) and Representative(s) Cochran, Quinlan, Woodson excused (3). Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2024
|
Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 867-24), recommending passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2024
|
The committee on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Sayama, Belatti, Hashem, Hussey-Burdick, Gates, Lowen, Onishi, Tam, Pierick; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Amato; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2024
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Wednesday, 02-28-24 2:00PM in House conference room 329 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2024
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kapela, Nakashima, Ward excused (3).
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2024
|
Reported from TRN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 86-24) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC.
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2024
|
The committee on TRN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Todd, Kila, Aiu, Evslin, Miyake, Onishi, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Kitagawa.
|
|
|
House
|
01/29/2024
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by TRN on Thursday, 02-01-24 10:00AM in House conference room 312 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
01/24/2024
|
Referred to TRN, CPC, referral sheet 1
|
|
|
House
|
01/17/2024
|
Introduced and Pass First Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
01/16/2024
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|