Senate
|
06/24/2024
|
Act 061, 06/21/2024 (Gov. Msg. No. 1162).
|
|
|
House
|
06/24/2024
|
Act 061, on 06/21/2024 (Gov. Msg. No. 1162).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2024
|
Received notice of House agreement and passage on Final Reading (Hse. Com. No. 802).
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2024
|
Transmitted to Governor.
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2024
|
Passed Final Reading as amended in SD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Holt, Kong, Nakashima excused (3).
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2024
|
House agrees to Senate amendment(s).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2024
|
Received notice of House reconsideration of action in disagreeing to the amendments proposed by the Senate (Hse. Com. No. 781).
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2024
|
Reconsideration of action taken on 04-11-24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2024
|
Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 731).
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2024
|
House disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2024
|
Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 499) in amended form (SD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2024
|
Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Ihara). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2024
|
One Day Notice 04-09-24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2024
|
Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3686) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2024
|
The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDC were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Gabbard, Elefante, San Buenaventura; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Awa.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2024
|
The committee(s) on JDC will hold a public decision making on 04-02-24 10:05AM; Conference Room 016 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2024
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2024
|
Reported from TCA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3229) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2024
|
The committee(s) on TCA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TCA were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Lee, Inouye, Elefante; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Kanuha, Awa.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2024
|
The committee on TCA will reconsider its previous decision made on 03-12-24 and will hold a public decision making on 03-19-24 3:01PM; Conference Room 224 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2024
|
The committee(s) on TCA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in TCA were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Lee, Inouye, Elefante, Kanuha, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2024
|
The committee(s) on TCA has scheduled a public hearing on 03-12-24 3:05PM; Conference Room 224 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2024
|
Referred to TCA, JDC.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2024
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2024
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 13).
|
|
|
House
|
02/29/2024
|
Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cochran, Holt excused (2). Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2024
|
Forty-eight (48) hours notice Thursday, 02-29-24.
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2024
|
Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 630-24) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
02/13/2024
|
The committee on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Sayama, Amato, Belatti, Hashem, Hussey-Burdick, Onishi, Tam; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Gates, Lowen, Pierick.
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2024
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Tuesday, 02-13-24 2:05PM in House conference room 329 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2024
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kapela, Nakashima, Ward excused (3).
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2024
|
Reported from TRN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 67-24) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC.
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2024
|
The committee on TRN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Todd, Kila, Aiu, Evslin, Miyake, Onishi, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Kitagawa.
|
|
|
House
|
01/29/2024
|
Proposed draft of Bill scheduled to be heard by TRN on Thursday, 02-01-24 10:00AM in House conference room 312 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
01/24/2024
|
Referred to TRN, CPC, referral sheet 1
|
|
|
House
|
01/17/2024
|
Introduced and Pass First Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
01/16/2024
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|