House | 02/14/2024 | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Pierick voting no (1) and Representative(s) Matayoshi, Takayama, Todd excused (3). | ||
House | 02/14/2024 | Reported from TRN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 334-24) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JHA. | ||
House | 02/08/2024 | The committee on TRN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Todd, Kila, Aiu, Evslin, Kitagawa, Miyake, Onishi, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. | ||
House | 02/05/2024 | Bill scheduled to be heard by TRN on Thursday, 02-08-24 9:00AM in House conference room 312 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. | ||
House | 01/24/2024 | Referred to TRN, JHA, referral sheet 1 | ||
House | 01/17/2024 | Introduced and Pass First Reading. | ||
House | 01/16/2024 | Prefiled. |