House
|
02/12/2024
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with Representative(s) Garcia voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Ward voting no (1) and Representative(s) Amato, Lowen, Nakashima, Quinlan, Todd excused (5).
|
|
|
House
|
02/12/2024
|
Reported from TRN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 258-24) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JHA.
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2024
|
The committee on TRN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Todd, Kila, Aiu, Kitagawa, Miyake, Onishi, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Evslin.
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2024
|
Bill scheduled for decision making on Thursday, 02-08-24 9:00AM in conference room 312 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2024
|
The committee(s) on TRN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-08-24.
|
|
|
House
|
02/02/2024
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by TRN on Tuesday, 02-06-24 10:00AM in House conference room 312 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
01/24/2024
|
Referred to TRN, JHA, referral sheet 1
|
|
|
House
|
01/17/2024
|
Introduced and Pass First Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
01/16/2024
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|