House
|
02/12/2024
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Chun, Garrett, Takenouchi, Woodson voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Alcos, Garcia, Kila, Kitagawa, Kobayashi, Kong, La Chica, Lamosao, Matayoshi, Matsumoto, Nishimoto, Pierick, Souza, Ward voting no (14) and Representative(s) Amato, Lowen, Nakashima, Quinlan, Todd excused (5).
|
|
|
House
|
02/12/2024
|
Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 266-24) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2024
|
The committee on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Tarnas, Takayama, Evslin, Ganaden, Ichiyama, Miyake, Souza; Ayes with reservations: none; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Kong; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Holt, Ilagan.
|
|
|
House
|
02/02/2024
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Tuesday, 02-06-24 2:00PM in House conference room 325 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
01/24/2024
|
Referred to JHA, FIN, referral sheet 1
|
|
|
House
|
01/17/2024
|
Introduced and Pass First Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
01/16/2024
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|