Senate
|
04/16/2024
|
Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 738).
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2024
|
House Conferees Appointed: Tarnas Chair; Ganaden, Miyake, Takayama, Souza.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2024
|
Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 731).
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2024
|
House disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2024
|
Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 505) in amended form (SD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2024
|
Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: none. Noes, 2 (Senator(s) Awa, Elefante). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2024
|
48 Hrs. Notice 04-09-24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2024
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2024
|
Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3648) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2024
|
The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Gabbard, San Buenaventura; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Elefante ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Awa.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2024
|
The committee(s) on JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 03-21-24 10:01AM; Conference Room 016 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2024
|
Referred to JDC.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2024
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2024
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 194).
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Aiu, Alcos, Garcia, Holt, Kong, Matsumoto, Pierick voting no (7) and Representative(s) Cochran, Woodson excused (2). Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
02/29/2024
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Garcia, Pierick voting no (2) and Representative(s) Aiu, Cochran, Garrett, Holt, Kahaloa, Lowen, Nishimoto, Quinlan, Todd excused (9).
|
|
|
House
|
02/29/2024
|
Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 675-24) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
The committee on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Tarnas, Takayama, Evslin, Ganaden, Ilagan, Miyake; Ayes with reservations: none; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Holt; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Ichiyama, Kong, Souza.
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2024
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Thursday, 02-22-24 2:00PM in House conference room 325 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
01/24/2024
|
Referred to JHA, referral sheet 1
|
|
|
House
|
01/17/2024
|
Introduced and Pass First Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
01/16/2024
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|