Senate
|
03/07/2024
|
Referred to HOU, WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2024
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2024
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 14).
|
|
|
House
|
02/29/2024
|
Passed Third Reading with Representative(s) Chun, Garcia, Kong, Poepoe voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Alcos, Garrett, Hussey-Burdick, Kobayashi, Marten, Matayoshi, Nishimoto, Perruso, Sayama, Takenouchi, Ward voting no (11) and Representative(s) Belatti, Cochran, Holt excused (3). Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2024
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with Representative(s) Alcos, Chun, Kong, Lamosao, Matayoshi, Poepoe, Sayama voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Garcia, Garrett, Hussey-Burdick, Kobayashi, Marten, Nishimoto, Takenouchi, Ward voting no (8) and Representative(s) Amato, Cochran, Gates, Kapela, Perruso, Woodson excused (6).
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2024
|
Reported from HSG/WAL/JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 625-24) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
02/12/2024
|
The committee on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Tarnas, Takayama, Evslin, Ganaden, Holt, Ichiyama, Ilagan, Miyake, Souza; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Kong; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
02/12/2024
|
The committee on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Ichiyama, Poepoe, Ganaden, Hashem, M. Mizuno, Morikawa, Takayama, Souza; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Chun; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
02/12/2024
|
The committee on HSG recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Evslin, Aiu, Kila, Miyake, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Onishi; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Kitagawa, Todd.
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2024
|
Proposed draft of Bill scheduled to be heard by HSG/WAL/JHA on Monday, 02-12-24 2:30PM in House conference room 325 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
01/24/2024
|
Referred to HSG/WAL/JHA, referral sheet 1
|
|
|
House
|
01/17/2024
|
Introduced and Pass First Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
01/16/2024
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|