Senate
|
03/07/2024
|
Referred to EDU/HOU, WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2024
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2024
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 198).
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cochran, Woodson excused (2). Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2024
|
Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 871-24), recommending passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
02/26/2024
|
The committee on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamashita, Kitagawa, Aiu, Chun, Garrett, Kahaloa, Kila, Kobayashi, Lamosao, Morikawa, Nishimoto, Poepoe, Takenouchi, Alcos, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Cochran.
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2024
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Monday, 02-26-24 12:30PM in House conference room 308 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
02/13/2024
|
Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kila, Takayama excused (2).
|
|
|
House
|
02/13/2024
|
Reported from EDN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 283-24), recommending referral to FIN.
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2024
|
The committee on EDN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Woodson, La Chica, Kapela, Marten, Martinez, Matayoshi, M. Mizuno, Perruso, Todd, Garcia; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Quinlan.
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2024
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by EDN on Thursday, 02-08-24 2:00PM in House conference room 309 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
02/02/2024
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on EDN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Alcos, Gates, Kila, Nakashima excused (4).
|
|
|
House
|
02/02/2024
|
Reported from HSG (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 23-24) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to EDN.
|
|
|
House
|
01/31/2024
|
The committee on HSG recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Evslin, Kila, Miyake, Todd, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Aiu, Onishi; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Kitagawa.
|
|
|
House
|
01/29/2024
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by HSG on Wednesday, 01-31-24 10:00AM in House conference room 312 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
01/24/2024
|
Referred to HSG, EDN, FIN, referral sheet 1
|
|
|
House
|
01/17/2024
|
Introduced and Pass First Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
01/16/2024
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|