House
|
02/13/2024
|
The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2024
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Tuesday, 02-13-24 2:05PM in House conference room 329 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
02/05/2024
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cochran, Gates, Kapela, Nakashima excused (4).
|
|
|
House
|
02/05/2024
|
Reported from EDN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 39-24) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC.
|
|
|
House
|
01/30/2024
|
The committee on EDN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Woodson, La Chica, Kapela, Marten, Martinez, M. Mizuno, Perruso, Todd, Garcia; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Matayoshi, Quinlan.
|
|
|
House
|
01/26/2024
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by EDN on Tuesday, 01-30-24 2:00PM in House conference room 309 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
01/24/2024
|
Referred to EDN, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 1
|
|
|
House
|
01/18/2024
|
Introduced and Pass First Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
01/17/2024
|
Pending introduction.
|
|
|