Senate
|
03/07/2024
|
Referred to EDU, WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2024
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2024
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 202).
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Kapela, Perruso voting no (2) and Representative(s) Cochran, Gates, Kahaloa, Matayoshi, Woodson excused (5). Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2024
|
Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 987-24), recommending passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2024
|
The committee on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamashita, Kitagawa, Aiu, Chun, Kahaloa, Kobayashi, Lamosao, Morikawa, Nishimoto, Poepoe, Takenouchi, Alcos, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Cochran, Garrett, Kila.
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2024
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Friday, 02-23-24 1:00PM in House conference room 308 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2024
|
Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with Representative(s) Kapela voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aiu, Garrett, Perruso, Takayama, Todd excused (5).
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2024
|
Reported from LGO (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 489-24) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN.
|
|
|
House
|
02/13/2024
|
The committee on LGO recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Matayoshi, Garrett, Kapela, Alcos; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Martinez, Sayama, Tam.
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2024
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by LGO on Tuesday, 02-13-24 9:30AM in House conference room 309 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
02/05/2024
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on LGO with Representative(s) Perruso voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cochran, Gates, Kapela, Nakashima excused (4).
|
|
|
House
|
02/05/2024
|
Reported from EDN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 36-24) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to LGO.
|
|
|
House
|
01/30/2024
|
The committee on EDN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Woodson, La Chica, Marten, Martinez, M. Mizuno, Todd, Garcia; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Kapela, Perruso; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Matayoshi, Quinlan.
|
|
|
House
|
01/26/2024
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by EDN on Tuesday, 01-30-24 2:00PM in House conference room 309 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
01/24/2024
|
Referred to EDN, LGO, FIN, referral sheet 1
|
|
|
House
|
01/18/2024
|
Introduced and Pass First Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
01/17/2024
|
Pending introduction.
|
|
|