House | 02/13/2024 | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kila, Takayama excused (2). | ||
House | 02/13/2024 | Reported from EDN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 284-24) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. | ||
House | 02/08/2024 | The committee on EDN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Woodson, La Chica, Kapela, Marten, Martinez, Matayoshi, M. Mizuno, Perruso, Todd, Garcia; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Quinlan. | ||
House | 02/06/2024 | Bill scheduled to be heard by EDN on Thursday, 02-08-24 2:00PM in House conference room 309 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. | ||
House | 01/24/2024 | Referred to EDN, FIN, referral sheet 1 | ||
House | 01/18/2024 | Introduced and Pass First Reading. | ||
House | 01/17/2024 | Pending introduction. |