House
|
02/14/2024
|
Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Matayoshi, Takayama, Todd excused (3).
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2024
|
Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 397-24) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN.
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2024
|
The committee on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Sayama, Belatti, Hussey-Burdick, Gates, Lowen, Onishi, Pierick; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Nakashima, Amato, Hashem, Tam.
|
|
|
House
|
02/05/2024
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Thursday, 02-08-24 2:00PM in House conference room 329 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2024
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with Representative(s) Garcia voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Alcos, Kitagawa excused (2).
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2024
|
Reported from LGO (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 9-24) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC.
|
|
|
House
|
01/30/2024
|
The committee on LGO recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Matayoshi, Garrett, Kapela, Martinez, Tam, Alcos; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Sayama.
|
|
|
House
|
01/26/2024
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by LGO on Tuesday, 01-30-24 9:30AM in House conference room 309 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
01/24/2024
|
Referred to LGO, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 1
|
|
|
House
|
01/18/2024
|
Introduced and Pass First Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
01/17/2024
|
Pending introduction.
|
|
|