Senate
|
06/28/2024
|
Act 092, 06/27/2024 (Gov. Msg. No. 1193).
|
|
|
House
|
06/28/2024
|
Act 092, on 06/27/2024 (Gov. Msg. No. 1193).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2024
|
Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 830).
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2024
|
Transmitted to Governor.
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2024
|
Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 798).
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2024
|
Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Garcia voting no (1) and none excused (0).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2024
|
Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: none. Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Awa). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) McKelvey).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2024
|
48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-01-24
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2024
|
Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 127-24).
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2024
|
Forty-eight (48) hours notice Wednesday 05-01-24.
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2024
|
Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 127-24) as amended in (CD 1).
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2024
|
The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Matayoshi, Nishimoto, Garrett, Alcos; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Nakashima, Tam.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2024
|
The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keohokalole, Moriwaki, Aquino; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella.
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2024
|
Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday, 04-26-24 at 5:25PM in conference room 016.
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2024
|
Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday, 04-26-24 at 3:14PM in conference room 224.
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2024
|
Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Friday, 04-26-24 10:25AM in conference room 016.
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2024
|
Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 775).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2024
|
Senate Conferees Appointed: Keohokalole Chair; Moriwaki Co-Chair; Aquino, Fevella.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2024
|
Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 760).
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2024
|
House Conferees Appointed: Matayoshi, Nakashima, Nishimoto Co-Chairs; Garrett, Tam, Alcos.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2024
|
Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 731).
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2024
|
House disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2024
|
Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 512) in amended form (SD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2024
|
Report Adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: none. Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Awa). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Keohokalole). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2024
|
One Day Notice 04-09-24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2024
|
Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3751) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2024
|
The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 12 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Moriwaki, Aquino, Hashimoto, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Kim, Lee, Shimabukuro, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) DeCoite.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2024
|
The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-04-24 10:15AM; CR 211 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2024
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2024
|
Reported from CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3217) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2024
|
The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keohokalole, Fukunaga, McKelvey, Richards; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Awa; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2024
|
The committee(s) on CPN has scheduled a public hearing on 03-14-24 9:30AM; CR 229 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2024
|
Referred to CPN, WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2024
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2024
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 210).
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Kila, Lamosao, Pierick voting no (3) and Representative(s) Cochran, Gates, Kahaloa, Matayoshi, Woodson excused (5). Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2024
|
Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 955-24), recommending passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2024
|
The committee on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamashita, Kitagawa, Aiu, Chun, Garrett, Kahaloa, Kobayashi, Morikawa, Nishimoto, Poepoe, Takenouchi, Alcos, Ward; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Kila, Lamosao; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Cochran.
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2024
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 02-27-24 2:00PM in House conference room 308 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2024
|
Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Garcia voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Pierick voting no (1) and Representative(s) Matayoshi, Takayama, Todd excused (3).
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2024
|
Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 403-24), recommending referral to FIN.
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2024
|
The committee on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Sayama, Belatti, Hussey-Burdick, Gates, Lowen, Onishi, Pierick; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Nakashima, Amato, Hashem, Tam.
|
|
|
House
|
02/05/2024
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Thursday, 02-08-24 2:00PM in House conference room 329 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
02/02/2024
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with Representative(s) Garcia voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Alcos, Gates, Kila, Nakashima excused (4).
|
|
|
House
|
02/02/2024
|
Reported from LGO (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 25-24) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC.
|
|
|
House
|
01/30/2024
|
The committee on LGO recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Matayoshi, Garrett, Kapela, Martinez, Tam, Alcos; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Sayama.
|
|
|
House
|
01/26/2024
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by LGO on Tuesday, 01-30-24 9:30AM in House conference room 309 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
01/24/2024
|
Referred to LGO, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 1
|
|
|
House
|
01/18/2024
|
Introduced and Pass First Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
01/17/2024
|
Pending introduction.
|
|
|