Senate
|
03/22/2024
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2024
|
Reported from CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3218) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2024
|
The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keohokalole, Fukunaga, McKelvey, Richards, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2024
|
The committee(s) on CPN has scheduled a public hearing on 03-14-24 9:30AM; CR 229 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2024
|
Referred to CPN, WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2024
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2024
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 16).
|
|
|
House
|
02/29/2024
|
Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Kapela, Perruso voting no (2) and Representative(s) Cochran, Holt excused (2). Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
02/29/2024
|
Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 703-24), recommending passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
The committee on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamashita, Kitagawa, Aiu, Chun, Garrett, Kahaloa, Kila, Kobayashi, Lamosao, Morikawa, Poepoe, Takenouchi, Alcos, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Cochran, Nishimoto.
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2024
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 02-22-24 10:00AM in House conference room 308 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2024
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Nakashima, Ward excused (2).
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2024
|
Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 122-24) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
|
|
|
House
|
01/30/2024
|
The committee on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Sayama, Amato, Belatti, Hussey-Burdick, Onishi, Tam, Pierick; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Hashem, Gates, Lowen.
|
|
|
House
|
01/26/2024
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Tuesday, 01-30-24 2:00PM in House conference room 329 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
01/24/2024
|
Referred to CPC, FIN, referral sheet 1
|
|
|
House
|
01/19/2024
|
Introduced and Pass First Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
01/18/2024
|
Pending introduction.
|
|
|