House | 02/06/2024 | The committee(s) on WAL recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. | ||
House | 02/02/2024 | Bill scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 02-06-24 10:15AM in conference room 430 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. | ||
House | 02/01/2024 | The committee(s) on WAL recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-06-24. | ||
House | 01/29/2024 | Bill scheduled to be heard by WAL on Thursday, 02-01-24 9:00AM in House conference room 430 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. | ||
House | 01/29/2024 | Re-referred to WAL, JHA, FIN, referral sheet 4 | ||
House | 01/24/2024 | Referred to WAL, JHA, referral sheet 1 | ||
House | 01/19/2024 | Introduced and Pass First Reading. | ||
House | 01/18/2024 | Pending introduction. |