House
|
04/26/2024
|
Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday, 04-26-24 at 5:20PM in Conference Room 329.
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2024
|
Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-26-24 3:30PM in conference room 325.
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2024
|
Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-26-24 10:30AM in conference room 325.
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2024
|
Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday 04-25-24 10:30AM in conference room 325.
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2024
|
Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Wednesday 04-24-24 10:34AM in conference room 325.
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2024
|
Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Tuesday, 04-23-24 10:30AM in conference room 325.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2024
|
Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 760).
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2024
|
House Conferees Appointed: Lowen, Nakashima, Kitagawa Co-Chairs; Sayama, Tam, Ward.
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2024
|
Re-referred to EEP, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 32
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2024
|
Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 677).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2024
|
Senate Conferees Appointed: DeCoite Chair; Keohokalole, Wakai Co-Chairs; Fevella.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2024
|
Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 731).
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2024
|
House disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2024
|
Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 517) in amended form (SD 2).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2024
|
Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Ihara). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2024
|
48 Hrs. Notice 04-09-24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2024
|
Reported from CPN/WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3780) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2024
|
The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keohokalole, Fukunaga, McKelvey, Richards; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Awa.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2024
|
The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Moriwaki, DeCoite, Hashimoto, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Kim, Lee, Shimabukuro, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Aquino, Wakai.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2024
|
The committee(s) on CPN/WAM has rescheduled its decision making to 04-02-24 10:45AM; Conference Room 211 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2024
|
The committee(s) on CPN/WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-02-24 10:00AM; Conference Room 211 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2024
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to CPN/WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2024
|
Reported from EET (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3145) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to CPN/WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2024
|
The committee(s) on EET recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EET were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) DeCoite, Wakai, Fukunaga, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Kim.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2024
|
The committee(s) on EET has scheduled a public hearing on 03-14-24 1:01PM; Conference Room 229 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2024
|
Referred to EET, CPN/WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2024
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2024
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 98).
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2024
|
Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cochran, Quinlan, Woodson excused (3). Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2024
|
Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 861-24), recommending passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2024
|
The committee on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Sayama, Amato, Hashem, Hussey-Burdick, Gates, Lowen, Onishi, Tam, Pierick; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti.
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2024
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Wednesday, 02-28-24 2:00PM in House conference room 329 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2024
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Nakashima, Ward excused (2).
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2024
|
Reported from EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 148-24) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC.
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2024
|
The committee on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Lowen, Cochran, Gates, Kahaloa, Perruso; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Woodson, Ward.
|
|
|
House
|
01/29/2024
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP on Thursday, 02-01-24 9:30AM in House conference room 325 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
01/24/2024
|
Referred to EEP, CPC, referral sheet 1
|
|
|
House
|
01/19/2024
|
Introduced and Pass First Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
01/18/2024
|
Pending introduction.
|
|
|