Senate
|
03/07/2024
|
Referred to PSM, WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2024
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2024
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 100).
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2024
|
Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cochran, Quinlan, Woodson excused (3). Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2024
|
Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 845-24), recommending passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
02/26/2024
|
The committee on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamashita, Kitagawa, Aiu, Chun, Garrett, Kahaloa, Kila, Kobayashi, Lamosao, Morikawa, Nishimoto, Poepoe, Takenouchi, Alcos, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Cochran.
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2024
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Monday, 02-26-24 2:00PM in House conference room 308 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2024
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Matayoshi, Takayama, Todd excused (3).
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2024
|
Reported from WAL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 318-24) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
|
|
|
House
|
01/30/2024
|
The committee on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Ichiyama, Poepoe, Chun, Ganaden, Hashem, M. Mizuno, Morikawa, Takayama, Souza; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
01/26/2024
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by WAL on Tuesday, 01-30-24 9:00AM in House conference room 430 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
01/24/2024
|
Referred to WAL, FIN, referral sheet 1
|
|
|
House
|
01/19/2024
|
Introduced and Pass First Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
01/18/2024
|
Pending introduction.
|
|
|