Senate
|
04/18/2024
|
Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 760).
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2024
|
House Conferees Appointed: Tarnas, Nishimoto Co-Chairs; Kong, Takayama, Souza.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2024
|
Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 731).
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2024
|
House disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2024
|
Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 526) in amended form (SD 2).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2024
|
Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Ihara). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2024
|
48 Hrs. Notice 04-09-24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2024
|
Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3798) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2024
|
The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Moriwaki, Aquino, Hashimoto, Inouye, Kanuha, Kim, Lee, Shimabukuro, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) DeCoite, Kidani.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2024
|
The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-03-24 10:30AM; CR 211 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2024
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2024
|
Reported from PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3098) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2024
|
The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in PSM were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Elefante, Fukunaga, Rhoads, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2024
|
The committee(s) on PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 03-11-24 3:00PM; CR 225 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2024
|
Referred to PSM, WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2024
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2024
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 103).
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2024
|
Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cochran, Quinlan, Woodson excused (3). Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2024
|
Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 852-24), recommending passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2024
|
The committee on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamashita, Kitagawa, Aiu, Chun, Garrett, Kahaloa, Kila, Kobayashi, Lamosao, Morikawa, Nishimoto, Poepoe, Takenouchi, Alcos, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Cochran.
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2024
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 02-27-24 12:00PM in House conference room 308 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2024
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Garrett, Matayoshi, Perruso, Sayama, Takayama excused (5).
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2024
|
Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 472-24) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2024
|
The committee on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Tarnas, Takayama, Evslin, Ganaden, Holt, Ichiyama, Ilagan, Kong, Souza; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Miyake.
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2024
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Thursday, 02-08-24 2:00PM in House conference room 325 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
01/29/2024
|
Re-referred to JHA, FIN, referral sheet 4
|
|
|
House
|
01/24/2024
|
Referred to JHA, referral sheet 1
|
|
|
House
|
01/19/2024
|
Introduced and Pass First Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
01/18/2024
|
Pending introduction.
|
|
|