12/11/2023 | Carried over to 2024 Regular Session. | |||
House | 02/14/2023 | The committee(s) on TRN/EEP recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. | ||
House | 02/10/2023 | Bill scheduled to be heard by TRN/EEP on Tuesday, 02-14-23 10:30AM in House conference room 325 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. | ||
House | 01/27/2023 | Re-referred to TRN/EEP, JHA, referral sheet 2 | ||
House | 01/25/2023 | Referred to TRN, EEP, JHA, referral sheet 1 | ||
House | 01/19/2023 | Introduced and Pass First Reading. | ||
House | 01/18/2023 | Pending introduction. |