Senate
|
03/07/2024
|
Referred to EET/AEN, CPN/JDC.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2024
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2024
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 251).
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with Representative(s) Lamosao, Miyake voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Alcos, Garcia, Kong, Pierick voting no (4) and Representative(s) Cochran, Woodson excused (2). Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2024
|
Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-05-24.
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2024
|
Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 906-24) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2024
|
The committee on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Sayama, Amato, Hashem, Hussey-Burdick, Gates, Lowen, Onishi, Tam; Ayes with reservations: none; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Pierick; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti.
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2024
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Wednesday, 02-28-24 2:00PM in House conference room 329 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2024
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Garcia, Pierick voting no (2) and Representative(s) Matayoshi, Takayama, Todd excused (3).
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2024
|
Reported from EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 394-24) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC.
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2024
|
The committee on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Lowen, Cochran, Gates, Kahaloa, Woodson, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Perruso.
|
|
|
House
|
01/31/2024
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP on Thursday, 02-08-24 9:30AM in House conference room 325 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
01/29/2024
|
Re-referred to EEP, CPC, referral sheet 5
|
|
|
House
|
01/24/2024
|
Referred to TOU/EEP, CPC, referral sheet 1
|
|
|
House
|
01/19/2024
|
Introduced and Pass First Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
01/18/2024
|
Pending introduction.
|
|
|