Senate
|
04/12/2024
|
Act 004, 04/12/2024 (Gov. Msg. No. 1104).
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2024
|
Act 004, on 04/12/2024 (Gov. Msg. No. 1104).
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2024
|
Transmitted to Governor.
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2024
|
Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 342).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2024
|
Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 21; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Inouye . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 4 (Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Ihara, McKelvey, Richards). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2024
|
One Day Notice 03-25-24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2024
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2024
|
Reported from TCA/AEN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3254) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2024
|
The committee(s) on TCA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in TCA were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Lee, Elefante, Kanuha, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Inouye ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2024
|
The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in AEN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Richards, DeCoite, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Rhoads.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2024
|
The committee(s) on TCA/AEN has scheduled a public hearing on 03-12-24 3:00PM; CR 224 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2024
|
Referred to TCA/AEN.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2024
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2024
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 21).
|
|
|
House
|
02/29/2024
|
Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cochran, Holt excused (2). Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
02/29/2024
|
Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 733-24), recommending passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2024
|
The committee on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Tarnas, Evslin, Ganaden, Ichiyama, Ilagan, Kong, Miyake; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Takayama, Holt, Souza.
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2024
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Friday, 02-16-24 2:00PM in House conference room 325 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
02/02/2024
|
Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Alcos, Gates, Kila, Nakashima excused (4).
|
|
|
House
|
02/02/2024
|
Reported from CAI (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 16-24), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JHA.
|
|
|
House
|
01/31/2024
|
The committee on CAI recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Tam, Martinez, Garrett, Kapela, Matayoshi; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Sayama, Alcos.
|
|
|
House
|
01/26/2024
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by CAI on Wednesday, 01-31-24 10:00AM in House conference room 309 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
01/24/2024
|
Referred to CAI, JHA, referral sheet 1
|
|
|
House
|
01/22/2024
|
Introduced and Pass First Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
01/19/2024
|
Pending introduction.
|
|
|