Senate
|
04/03/2024
|
The committee on WAM has deleted the measure from decision making scheduled on 04-04-24 10:15AM; CR 211 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2024
|
The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-04-24 10:15AM; CR 211 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2024
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2024
|
Reported from EDU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3121) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2024
|
The committee(s) on EDU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EDU were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kidani, Kim, Hashimoto, Richards, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2024
|
The committee(s) on EDU has scheduled a public hearing on 03-13-24 3:00PM; CR 229 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2024
|
Referred to EDU, WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2024
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2024
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 106).
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2024
|
Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cochran, Quinlan, Woodson excused (3). Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2024
|
Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 765-24), recommending passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2024
|
The committee on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamashita, Kitagawa, Aiu, Chun, Kahaloa, Kobayashi, Lamosao, Morikawa, Nishimoto, Poepoe, Takenouchi, Alcos, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Cochran, Garrett, Kila.
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2024
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Friday, 02-23-24 1:00PM in House conference room 308 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
02/12/2024
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Amato, Lowen, Nakashima, Quinlan, Todd excused (5).
|
|
|
House
|
02/12/2024
|
Reported from EDN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 242-24) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2024
|
The committee on EDN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Woodson, La Chica, Marten, Martinez, Matayoshi, M. Mizuno, Perruso, Quinlan, Todd, Garcia; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Kapela.
|
|
|
House
|
02/02/2024
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by EDN on Tuesday, 02-06-24 2:00PM in House conference room 309 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
01/24/2024
|
Referred to EDN, FIN, referral sheet 1
|
|
|
House
|
01/22/2024
|
Introduced and Pass First Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
01/19/2024
|
Pending introduction.
|
|
|