House | 02/13/2024 | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Garcia, Ward voting no (2) and Representative(s) Kila, Takayama excused (2). | ||
House | 02/13/2024 | Reported from LGO (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 276-24) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. | ||
House | 02/08/2024 | The committee on LGO recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Matayoshi, Garrett, Kapela, Tam; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Martinez, Sayama, Alcos. | ||
House | 02/05/2024 | Bill scheduled to be heard by LGO on Thursday, 02-08-24 10:00AM in House conference room 309 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. | ||
House | 01/24/2024 | Referred to LGO, FIN, referral sheet 1 | ||
House | 01/22/2024 | Introduced and Pass First Reading. | ||
House | 01/19/2024 | Pending introduction. |