House
|
04/19/2024
|
Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 721).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2024
|
Senate Conferees Appointed: Rhoads Chair; Lee Co-Chair; Elefante, Awa.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2024
|
Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 731).
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2024
|
House disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2024
|
Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 531) in amended form (SD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2024
|
Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Ihara). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2024
|
One Day Notice 04-09-24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2024
|
Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3698) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2024
|
The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Moriwaki, Aquino, Hashimoto, Inouye, Kanuha, Kim, Lee, Shimabukuro, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) DeCoite, Kidani.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2024
|
The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-03-24 10:30AM; CR 211 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2024
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2024
|
Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3110) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2024
|
The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Gabbard, Elefante, San Buenaventura, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2024
|
The committee(s) on JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 03-12-24 10:00AM; CR 016 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2024
|
Referred to JDC, WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2024
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2024
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 255).
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cochran, Martinez, Woodson excused (3). Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2024
|
Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-05-24.
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2024
|
Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 943-24) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
The committee on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamashita, Kitagawa, Aiu, Chun, Garrett, Kahaloa, Kila, Kobayashi, Lamosao, Morikawa, Takenouchi, Alcos, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Cochran, Nishimoto, Poepoe.
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2024
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 02-22-24 11:30AM in House conference room 308 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
02/05/2024
|
Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cochran, Gates, Kapela, Nakashima excused (4).
|
|
|
House
|
02/05/2024
|
Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 46-24), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
|
|
|
House
|
01/31/2024
|
The committee on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Tarnas, Takayama, Evslin, Ganaden, Holt, Ilagan, Kong, Miyake, Souza; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ichiyama.
|
|
|
House
|
01/29/2024
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Wednesday, 01-31-24 2:00PM in House conference room 325 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
01/24/2024
|
Referred to JHA, FIN, referral sheet 1
|
|
|
House
|
01/22/2024
|
Introduced and Pass First Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
01/19/2024
|
Pending introduction.
|
|
|