Senate
|
04/18/2024
|
Act 007, 04/18/2024 (Gov. Msg. No. 1107).
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2024
|
Act 007, on 04/18/2024 (Gov. Msg. No. 1107).
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2024
|
Transmitted to Governor.
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2024
|
Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 490).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2024
|
Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Ihara). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2024
|
One Day Notice 04-09-24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2024
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2024
|
Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3676) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2024
|
The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDC were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Gabbard, Elefante; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) San Buenaventura, Awa.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2024
|
The committee(s) on JDC deferred the measure until 04-02-24 10:00AM; Conference Room 016.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2024
|
The committee(s) on JDC deferred the measure until 03-21-24 10:00AM; Conference Room 016.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2024
|
Re-Referred to JDC.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2024
|
The committee(s) on JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 03-15-24 9:45AM; Conference Room 016 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2024
|
Referred to JDC, WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2024
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2024
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 24).
|
|
|
House
|
02/29/2024
|
Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Belatti, Cochran, Holt excused (3). Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2024
|
Passed Second Reading; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Amato, Cochran, Gates, Kapela, Perruso, Woodson excused (6).
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2024
|
Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 623-24), recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
01/31/2024
|
The committee on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Tarnas, Takayama, Evslin, Ganaden, Holt, Ilagan, Kong, Miyake, Souza; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ichiyama.
|
|
|
House
|
01/29/2024
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Wednesday, 01-31-24 2:00PM in House conference room 325 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
01/24/2024
|
Referred to JHA, referral sheet 1
|
|
|
House
|
01/22/2024
|
Introduced and Pass First Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
01/19/2024
|
Pending introduction.
|
|
|