House
|
04/25/2024
|
Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-26-24 5:00PM in conference room 325.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2024
|
Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-25-24 1:45PM; CR 325.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2024
|
Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-24-24 1:35PM; Conference Room 325.
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2024
|
Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Tuesday 04-23-24 1:35PM in conference room 325.
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2024
|
Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Monday 04-22-24 1:35PM in conference room 325.
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2024
|
Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Friday, 04-19-24 1:30PM in conference room 325.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2024
|
Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 760).
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2024
|
House Conferees Appointed: Tarnas, Nishimoto Co-Chairs; Kitagawa, Souza.
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2024
|
Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 677).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2024
|
Senate Conferees Appointed: Rhoads Chair; Aquino, Shimabukuro Co-Chairs; Awa.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2024
|
Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 731).
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2024
|
House disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2024
|
Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 535) in amended form (SD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2024
|
Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Ihara). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2024
|
One Day Notice 04-09-24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2024
|
Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3700) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2024
|
The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Moriwaki, Aquino, Hashimoto, Inouye, Kanuha, Kim, Lee, Shimabukuro, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) DeCoite, Kidani.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2024
|
The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-03-24 10:30AM; CR 211 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2024
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2024
|
Reported from JDC/LBT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3192) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2024
|
The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Elefante, San Buenaventura, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2024
|
The committee(s) on LBT recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in LBT were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Aquino, Moriwaki, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara, Lee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2024
|
The committee(s) on JDC/LBT has scheduled a public hearing on 03-19-24 9:30AM; Conference Room 016 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2024
|
Referred to JDC/LBT, WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2024
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2024
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 257).
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Pierick voting no (1) and Representative(s) Cochran, Woodson excused (2). Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2024
|
Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 941-24), recommending passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2024
|
The committee on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamashita, Kitagawa, Aiu, Chun, Garrett, Kahaloa, Kila, Kobayashi, Lamosao, Morikawa, Nishimoto, Poepoe, Takenouchi, Alcos, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Cochran.
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2024
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 02-27-24 10:00AM in House conference room 308 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2024
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kapela, Nakashima, Ward excused (3).
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2024
|
Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 90-24) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
|
|
|
House
|
01/31/2024
|
The committee on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Tarnas, Takayama, Evslin, Ganaden, Holt, Ilagan, Kong, Miyake, Souza; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ichiyama.
|
|
|
House
|
01/29/2024
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Wednesday, 01-31-24 2:00PM in House conference room 325 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
01/24/2024
|
Referred to JHA, FIN, referral sheet 1
|
|
|
House
|
01/22/2024
|
Introduced and Pass First Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
01/19/2024
|
Pending introduction.
|
|
|